ЦЕНТРАЛЬНЫЙ БАНК РОССИЙСКОЙ ФЕДЕРАЦИИ
ПИСЬМО
от 12 мая 2011 г. N 69-Т
О МЕРАХ
ПО ВЫПОЛНЕНИЮ РЕЗОЛЮЦИЙ СОВЕТА БЕЗОПАСНОСТИ ООН В ОТНОШЕНИИ
ДЕМОКРАТИЧЕСКОЙ РЕСПУБЛИКИ КОНГО
По информации, полученной из Министерства иностранных дел Российской Федерации, решением Комитета Совета Безопасности ООН, учрежденного резолюцией Совета Безопасности ООН 1533 от 12 марта 2004 г., с 1 декабря 2010 года обновлен список физических и юридических лиц, на которых распространяется действие мер, предусмотренных пунктом 15 резолюции Совета Безопасности ООН 1596 (2005) с учетом последующих резолюций Совета Безопасности ООН в отношении Демократической Республики Конго (далее - список).
В связи с этим в целях обеспечения исполнения положений Указов Президента Российской Федерации
от 24 июня 2005 г. N 720 "О мерах по выполнению резолюции Совета Безопасности ООН 1596 от 18 апреля 2005 г." и
от 17 октября 2008 г. N 1490 "О мерах в связи с принятием резолюции Совета Безопасности ООН 1807 от 31 марта 2008 г." направляется актуализированный список.
Доведите настоящее письмо до сведения кредитных организаций.
Заместитель председателя Банка России
В.Н.МЕЛЬНИКОВ
Приложение
к письму Банка России
от 12.05.2011 N 69-Т
СПИСОК
ФИЗИЧЕСКИХ И ЮРИДИЧЕСКИХ ЛИЦ, НА КОТОРЫХ РАСПРОСТРАНЯЕТСЯ
ДЕЙСТВИЕ МЕР, ПРЕДУСМОТРЕННЫХ ПУНКТАМИ 13 И 15 РЕЗОЛЮЦИИ
СОВЕТА БЕЗОПАСНОСТИ ООН 1596 ОТ 18 АПРЕЛЯ 2005 Г.,
ПРИМЕНЯЕМЫМИ С УЧЕТОМ ПОСЛЕДУЮЩИХ РЕЗОЛЮЦИЙ
СОВЕТА БЕЗОПАСНОСТИ ООН В ОТНОШЕНИИ
ДЕМОКРАТИЧЕСКОЙ РЕСПУБЛИКИ КОНГО
┌─────────────┬─────────┬─────────────┬───────────────────┬──────────────────┬───────────────────────────┐
│ LAST NAME │ FIRST │ ALIAS │ DATE OF BIRTH/ │ PASSPORT/ │DESIGNATION/ JUSTIFICATION │
│ │ NAME │ │ PLACE OF BIRTH │ IDENTIFYING │ │
│ │ │ │ │ INFORMATION │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ ФАМИЛИЯ │ ИМЯ │ ПСЕВДОНИМЫ │ ДАТА РОЖДЕНИЯ/ │ ПАСПОРТ/ │ ДЕЯТЕЛЬНОСТЬ │
│ │ │ │ МЕСТО РОЖДЕНИЯ │ИДЕНТИФИКАЦИОННЫЕ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ ДАННЫЕ │ │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│BWAMBALE │Frank │Frank │ │Left the CNDP in │Former RCD-ML leader, │
│ │Kakolele │Kakorere │ │January 2008. As │exercising influence over │
│ │ │Frank │ │of December 2008 │policies and maintaining │
│ │ │Kakorere │ │resides in │command and control over │
│ │ │Bwambale │ │Kinshasa │the activities of RCD-ML │
│ │ │ │ │ │forces, one of the armed │
│ │ │ │ │ │groups and militias │
│ │ │ │ │ │referred to in paragraph │
│ │ │ │ │ │20 of Res. 1493 (2003), │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │ │trafficking of arms, in │
│ │ │ │ │ │violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │ │embargo │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│IYAMUREMYE │Gaston │Rumuli │1948 │Second Vice │According to multiple │
│ │ │ │ │President of FDLR │sources, including the │
│ │ │Byiringiro │Musanze District │ │UNSC DRC Sanctions │
│ │ │Victor Rumuli│(Northern │Brigadier General │Committee's Group of │
│ │ │ │Province), │ │Experts, Gaston Iyamuremye │
│ │ │Victor Rumuri│ │As of November │is the second vice │
│ │ │ │Rwanda Ruhengeri, │2010, resides │president of the FDLR and │
│ │ │Michel │Rwanda │either in Kibua, │is considered a core │
│ │ │Byiringiro │ │North Kivu, DRC, │member of the FDLR │
│ │ │ │ │or in Aru, │military and political │
│ │ │ │ │Orientale │leadership. Gaston │
│ │ │ │ │Province, DRC │Iyamuremye also ran Ignace │
│ │ │ │ │ │Murwanashyaka's (President │
│ │ │ │ │ │of the FDLR) office in │
│ │ │ │ │ │Kibua, DRC until December │
│ │ │ │ │ │2009 │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│KAKWAVU │Jerome │Jerome │ │Congolese │Former President of │
│BUKANDE │ │Kakwavu │ │ │UCD/FAPC. FAPC's control │
│ │ │ │ │Known as: │of illegal border posts │
│ │ │ │ │'Commandant │between Uganda and the DRC │
│ │ │ │ │Jerome' │- a key transit route for │
│ │ │ │ │ │arms flows. As President │
│ │ │ │ │As of June 2010, │of the FAPC, he exercises │
│ │ │ │ │has been arrested │influence over policies │
│ │ │ │ │and is now being │and maintains command and │
│ │ │ │ │held in Kinshasa │control over the │
│ │ │ │ │central prison. │activities of FAPC forces, │
│ │ │ │ │Judicial │which have been involved │
│ │ │ │ │proceedings have │in arms trafficking and, │
│ │ │ │ │been initiated │consequently, in │
│ │ │ │ │against him and │violations of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │two other of the │embargo. Given the rank of │
│ │ │ │ │five senior FARDC │General in the FARDC in │
│ │ │ │ │officers │December 2004. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │ │Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │ │recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │ │children in Ituri in 2002. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │One of five senior FARDC │
│ │ │ │ │ │officers who had been │
│ │ │ │ │ │accused of serious crimes │
│ │ │ │ │ │involving sexual violence │
│ │ │ │ │ │and whose cases the │
│ │ │ │ │ │Security Council had │
│ │ │ │ │ │brought to the │
│ │ │ │ │ │Government's attention │
│ │ │ │ │ │during its visit in 2009 │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│KATANGA │Germain │ │ │Congolese │FRPI chief. Appointed │
│ │ │ │ │ │General in the FARDC in │
│ │ │ │ │Under house arrest│December 2004. Involved in │
│ │ │ │ │in Kinshasa from │weapons transfers, in │
│ │ │ │ │March 2005 for │violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │FRPI involvement │embargo. │
│ │ │ │ │in human rights │ │
│ │ │ │ │abuses. │According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │Handed over by the│Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │ │ │Government of the │responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │DRC to the │recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │International │children in Ituri from │
│ │ │ │ │Criminal Court on │2002 to 2003 │
│ │ │ │ │18 October 2007 │ │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│LUBANGA │Thomas │ │Ituri │Congolese │President of the UPC/L, │
│ │ │ │ │ │one of the armed groups │
│ │ │ │ │Arrested in │and militias referred to │
│ │ │ │ │Kinshasa in March │in paragraph 20 of Res. │
│ │ │ │ │2005 for UPC/L │1493 (2003), involved in │
│ │ │ │ │involvement in │the trafficking of arms, │
│ │ │ │ │human rights │in violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │abuses violations.│embargo. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │Transferred to the│According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │ICC by the │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │Congolese │Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │ │ │authorities on 17 │responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │March 2006. │recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │ │children in Ituri from │
│ │ │ │ │As of December │2002 to 2003 │
│ │ │ │ │2008 is being │ │
│ │ │ │ │tried for war │ │
│ │ │ │ │crimes │ │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MANDRO │Khawa │Kawa Panga │20 August 1973, │Congolese │Ex-President of PUSIC, one │
│ │Panga │ │Bunia │ │of the armed groups and │
│ │ │Kawa Panga │ │Known as: │militia referred to in │
│ │ │Mandro │ │"Chief Kahwa" │paragraph 20 of Res. 1493 │
│ │ │ │ │"Kawa" │(2003) involved in arms │
│ │ │Kawa Mandro │ │ │trafficking, in violation │
│ │ │ │ │Arrested by │of the arms embargo. In │
│ │ │Yves Andoul │ │Congolese │prison in Bunia since │
│ │ │Karim │ │authorities in │04/05 for sabotage of the │
│ │ │ │ │October 2005, │Ituri peace process. │
│ │ │Mandro Panga │ │acquitted by the │ │
│ │ │Kahwa │ │Court of Appeal in│According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │Kisangani, │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │Yves Khawa │ │subsequently │Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │Panga Mandro │ │transferred to the│responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │judicial │recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │authorities in │children from 2001 to 2002 │
│ │ │ │ │Kinshasa on new │ │
│ │ │ │ │charges of crimes │ │
│ │ │ │ │against humanity, │ │
│ │ │ │ │war crimes, │ │
│ │ │ │ │murder, aggravated│ │
│ │ │ │ │assault and │ │
│ │ │ │ │battery │ │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MBARUSHIMANA │Callixte │ │24 July 1963, │Rwandan │Executive Secretary of the │
│ │ │ │Ndusu/Ruhen geri │ │FDLR and Vice-President of │
│ │ │ │Northern Province, │Current location: │the FDLR military high │
│ │ │ │Rwanda │Paris or Thais, │command. │
│ │ │ │ │France │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │Political/Military leader │
│ │ │ │ │ │of a foreign armed group │
│ │ │ │ │ │operating in the │
│ │ │ │ │ │Democratic Republic of the │
│ │ │ │ │ │Congo, impeding the │
│ │ │ │ │ │disarmament and the │
│ │ │ │ │ │voluntary repatriation and │
│ │ │ │ │ │resettlement of │
│ │ │ │ │ │combatants, per Security │
│ │ │ │ │ │Council resolution 1857 │
│ │ │ │ │ │(2008) OP 4 (b) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MPAMO │Iruta │Mpano │28 December 1965, │Congolese │Owner/Manager of the │
│ │Douglas │ │Bashali, Masisi │ │Compagnie Aerienne des │
│ │ │Douglas Iruta│ │Based in Goma and │Grands Lacs and of Great │
│ │ │Mpamo │29 December 1965, │Gisenyi, Rwanda. │Lakes Business Company, │
│ │ │ │Goma, DRC (formerly│Frequently travels│whose aircraft were used │
│ │ │ │Zaire) │across │to provide assistance to │
│ │ │ │ │international │armed groups and militias │
│ │ │ │ │border between │referred to in paragraph │
│ │ │ │ │Rwanda and Congo. │20 of Res. 1493 (2003). │
│ │ │ │ │ │Also responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │Address: │disguising information on │
│ │ │ │ │Bld Kanyamuhanga │flights and cargo │
│ │ │ │ │52, Goma │apparently to allow for │
│ │ │ │ │ │the violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │ │embargo │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MUDACUMURA │Sylvestre│ │ │Rwandan │FDLR commander, exercising │
│ │ │ │ │ │influence over policies, │
│ │ │ │ │Known as: │and maintaining command │
│ │ │ │ │"Radja" │and control over the │
│ │ │ │ │"Mupenzi Bernard" │activities of FDLR forces, │
│ │ │ │ │"General Major │one of the armed groups │
│ │ │ │ │Mupenzi" │and militias referred to │
│ │ │ │ │"General │in paragraph 20 of Res. │
│ │ │ │ │Mudacumura" │1493 (2003), involved in │
│ │ │ │ │ │trafficking of arms, in │
│ │ │ │ │As of November │violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │2009, continues to│embargo. │
│ │ │ │ │serve as FDLR-FOCA│ │
│ │ │ │ │military │Mudacumura (or staff) was │
│ │ │ │ │commander. │in telephone communication │
│ │ │ │ │ │with FDLR leader │
│ │ │ │ │Based in Kibua, │Murwanashyaka in Germany, │
│ │ │ │ │Masisi territory, │including at the time of │
│ │ │ │ │DRC │the Busurungi Massacre May │
│ │ │ │ │ │2009, and military │
│ │ │ │ │ │commander Major Guillaume │
│ │ │ │ │ │during Umoja Welu and │
│ │ │ │ │ │Kimia 11 operations in │
│ │ │ │ │ │2009. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │ │Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsible for 27 cases │
│ │ │ │ │ │of recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │ │children by troops under │
│ │ │ │ │ │his command in North Kivu │
│ │ │ │ │ │from 2002 to 2007 │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MUGARAGU │Leodomir │Manzi Leon │1954 │Address: Katoyi, │According to open-source │
│ │ │ │ │North Kivu, DRC │and official reporting, │
│ │ │Leo Manzi │1953 │ │Leodomir Mugaragu is the │
│ │ │ │ │FDLR/FOCA Chief of│Chief of Staff of the │
│ │ │ │Kigali, Rwanda │Staff │Forces Combattantes │
│ │ │ │ │ │Abucunguzi/Combatant Force │
│ │ │ │Rushashi (Northern │Brigadier General │for the Liberation of │
│ │ │ │Province), Rwanda │ │Rwanda (FOCA), the FDLR's │
│ │ │ │ │ │armed wing. According to │
│ │ │ │ │ │official reporting │
│ │ │ │ │ │Mugaragu is a senior │
│ │ │ │ │ │planner for FDLR's │
│ │ │ │ │ │military operations in the │
│ │ │ │ │ │eastern DRC │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MUJYAMBERE │Leopold │Musenyeri │17 March 1962, │Rwandan │Commander of the Second │
│ │ │ │Kigali, Rwanda │ │Division of FOCA/the │
│ │ │Achille │ │Rank: Colonel │Reserve Brigades (an FDLR │
│ │ │ │Est. 1966 │ │armed branch). Military │
│ │ │Frere Petrus │ │Current location: │leader of a foreign armed │
│ │ │Ibrahim │ │Mwenga, South │group operating in the │
│ │ │ │ │Kivu, DRC │Democratic Republic of the │
│ │ │ │ │ │Congo, impeding the │
│ │ │ │ │ │disarmament and the │
│ │ │ │ │ │voluntary repatriation and │
│ │ │ │ │ │resettlement of │
│ │ │ │ │ │combatants, in violation │
│ │ │ │ │ │of Security Council │
│ │ │ │ │ │resolution 1857 (2008) OP 4│
│ │ │ │ │ │(b). In evidence │
│ │ │ │ │ │collated by the UNSC DRC │
│ │ │ │ │ │Sanctions Committee Group │
│ │ │ │ │ │of Experts, detailed in │
│ │ │ │ │ │its report of 13 February │
│ │ │ │ │ │2008, girls recovered from │
│ │ │ │ │ │FDLR-FOCA had previously │
│ │ │ │ │ │been abducted and sexually │
│ │ │ │ │ │abused. Since mid-2007, │
│ │ │ │ │ │FDLR-FOCA, which │
│ │ │ │ │ │previously recruited boys │
│ │ │ │ │ │in their mid to late │
│ │ │ │ │ │teens, has been forcefully │
│ │ │ │ │ │recruiting youth from the │
│ │ │ │ │ │age of 10 years. The │
│ │ │ │ │ │youngest are then used as │
│ │ │ │ │ │escorts, and older │
│ │ │ │ │ │children are deployed as │
│ │ │ │ │ │soldiers on the frontline, │
│ │ │ │ │ │in violation of Security │
│ │ │ │ │ │Council resolution 1857 │
│ │ │ │ │ │(2008) OP 4 (d) and (e) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MURWANASHY- │Dr. │Ignace │14 May 1963, Butera│Rwandan │President of the FDLR, and │
│AKA │Ignace │ │(Rwanda) │Resident in │supreme commander of the │
│ │ │ │ │Germany │FDLR armed forces │
│ │ │ │Ngoma, Butare │ │exercising influence over │
│ │ │ │(Rwanda) │As of November │policies, and maintaining │
│ │ │ │ │2009, still │command and control over │
│ │ │ │ │recognized as the │the activities of FDLR │
│ │ │ │ │President of the │forces, one of the armed │
│ │ │ │ │FDLR-FOCA │groups and militias │
│ │ │ │ │political branch │referred to in paragraph │
│ │ │ │ │and supreme │20 of Res. 1493 (2003), │
│ │ │ │ │commander of the │involved in trafficking of │
│ │ │ │ │FDLR armed forces.│arms, in violation of the │
│ │ │ │ │ │arms embargo. │
│ │ │ │ │Arrested by German│ │
│ │ │ │ │Federal Police on │In telephone communication │
│ │ │ │ │17 November 2009 │with FDLR military field │
│ │ │ │ │on suspicion of │commanders (including │
│ │ │ │ │committing crimes │during the Busurungi May │
│ │ │ │ │against humanity │2009 massacre); gave │
│ │ │ │ │and war crimes in │military orders to the │
│ │ │ │ │the DRC, as well │high command; involved in │
│ │ │ │ │as on the basis of│coordinating the transfer │
│ │ │ │ │other charges │of arms and ammunition to │
│ │ │ │ │related to the │FDLR units and relaying │
│ │ │ │ │forming and │specific instructions for │
│ │ │ │ │membership of a │use; managing large sums │
│ │ │ │ │foreign terrorist │of money raised through │
│ │ │ │ │organization │illicit sale of natural │
│ │ │ │ │ │resources in areas of FDLR │
│ │ │ │ │ │control (pg. 24 - 25, 83). │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │Traveled to Uganda in 2006 │
│ │ │ │ │ │in violation of travel │
│ │ │ │ │ │ban. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │ │Armed Conflict, he held │
│ │ │ │ │ │command responsibility as │
│ │ │ │ │ │President and military │
│ │ │ │ │ │commander of FDLR for │
│ │ │ │ │ │recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │ │children by the FDLR in │
│ │ │ │ │ │Eastern Congo │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MUSONI │Straton │IO Musoni │6 April 1961 │Rwandan passport │Through his leadership of │
│ │ │ │(possibly 4 June │expired on 10 │the FDLR, a foreign armed │
│ │ │ │1961) Mugambazi, │September 2004 │group operating in the │
│ │ │ │Kigali, Rwanda │ │DRC, Musoni is impeding │
│ │ │ │ │Resident in │the disarmament and │
│ │ │ │ │Neuffen, Germany │voluntary repatriation or │
│ │ │ │ │ │resettlement of combatants │
│ │ │ │ │As of November │belonging to those groups, │
│ │ │ │ │2009, still │in breach of resolution │
│ │ │ │ │recognized as the │1649 (2005) │
│ │ │ │ │ st │ │
│ │ │ │ │1 Vice President│ │
│ │ │ │ │of the FDLR-FOCA │ │
│ │ │ │ │political branch │ │
│ │ │ │ │and President of │ │
│ │ │ │ │the FDLR military │ │
│ │ │ │ │high command. │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │Arrested by German│ │
│ │ │ │ │Federal Police on │ │
│ │ │ │ │17 November 2009 │ │
│ │ │ │ │on suspicion of │ │
│ │ │ │ │committing crimes │ │
│ │ │ │ │against humanity │ │
│ │ │ │ │and war crimes in │ │
│ │ │ │ │the DRC, as well │ │
│ │ │ │ │as on the basis of│ │
│ │ │ │ │other charges │ │
│ │ │ │ │related to the │ │
│ │ │ │ │forming and │ │
│ │ │ │ │membership of a │ │
│ │ │ │ │foreign terrorist │ │
│ │ │ │ │organization │ │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MUTEBUTSI │Jules │Jules │South Kivu │Congolese (South │Former FARDC Deputy │
│ │ │Mutebusi │ │Kivu) │Military Regional │
│ │ │ │ │ │Commander of 10th MR in │
│ │ │Jules │ │Arrested by the │April 2004, dismissed for │
│ │ │Mutebuzi │ │Rwandan │indiscipline and joined │
│ │ │ │ │authorities in │forces with other renegade │
│ │ │Colonel │ │December 2007 when│elements of former RCD-G │
│ │ │Mutebutsi │ │he tried to cross │to take town of Bukavu in │
│ │ │ │ │the border into │May 04 by force. │
│ │ │ │ │the DRC. │Implicated in the receipt │
│ │ │ │ │Reportedly he is │of weapons outside of │
│ │ │ │ │currently │FARDC structures and │
│ │ │ │ │"restrained." │provision of supplies to │
│ │ │ │ │ │armed groups and militia │
│ │ │ │ │ │mentioned in paragraph 20 │
│ │ │ │ │ │of Res. 1493 (2003), in │
│ │ │ │ │ │violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │ │embargo │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│NGUDJOLO │Mathieu, │Cui Ngudjolo │ │'Colonel' or │FNI Chief of Staff and │
│ │Chui │ │ │'General' │former Chief of Staff of │
│ │ │ │ │Surrendered by the│the FRPI, exercising │
│ │ │ │ │Government of the │influence over policies │
│ │ │ │ │DRC to the │and maintaining command │
│ │ │ │ │International │and control the activities │
│ │ │ │ │Criminal Court on │of FRPI forces, one of the │
│ │ │ │ │7 February 2008 │armed groups and militias │
│ │ │ │ │ │referred to in paragraph │
│ │ │ │ │ │20 of Res. 1493 (2003), │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │ │trafficking of arms, in │
│ │ │ │ │ │violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │ │ │embargo. Arrested by MONUC │
│ │ │ │ │ │in Bunia in October 2003. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │ │Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │ │recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │ │children under 15 years │
│ │ │ │ │ │old in Ituri in 2006 │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│NJABU │Floribert│Floribert │ │Arrested and │President of FNI, one of │
│ │Ngabu │Njabu │ │placed under house│the armed groups and │
│ │ │ │ │arrest in Kinshasa│militias referred to in │
│ │ │Floribert │ │from March 2005 │paragraph 20 of Res. 1493 │
│ │ │Ndjabu │ │for FNI │(2003), involved in the │
│ │ │ │ │involvement in │trafficking of arms, in │
│ │ │Floribert │ │human rights │violation of the arms │
│ │ │Ngabu Ndjabu │ │abuses │embargo │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│NKUNDA │Laurent │Nkunda Mihigo│6 February 1967 │Congolese │Former RCD-G General. │
│ │ │Laurent │North Kivu/Rutshuru│ │Joined forces with other │
│ │ │ │ │Known as: │renegade elements of │
│ │ │Laurent │2 February 1967 │"Chairman" │former RCD-G to take │
│ │ │Nkunda │ │"General Nkunda" │Bukavu in May 04 by force. │
│ │ │Bwatare │ │"Papa Six" │In receipt of weapons │
│ │ │ │ │ │outside of FARDC in │
│ │ │Laurent │ │Arrested on │violation of the arms │
│ │ │Nkundabatware│ │Rwandan soil in │embargo. Founder, National │
│ │ │ │ │January 2009 and │Congress for the People's │
│ │ │Laurent │ │subsequently │Defense, 2006; Senior │
│ │ │Nkunda Mahoro│ │replaced as │Officer, Rally for │
│ │ │Batware │ │commander of the │Congolese Democracy-Goma │
│ │ │ │ │CNDP in North Kivu│(RCD-G), 1998 - 2006; │
│ │ │Laurent │ │ │Officer Rwandan Patriotic │
│ │ │Nkunda │ │ │Front (RPF), 1992 - 1998. │
│ │ │Batware │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │ │Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsible for 264 cases │
│ │ │ │ │ │of recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │ │children by troops under │
│ │ │ │ │ │his command in North Kivu │
│ │ │ │ │ │from 2002 to 2009. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │As of November 2009, │
│ │ │ │ │ │despite arrest in Rwanda │
│ │ │ │ │ │in January 2009 and │
│ │ │ │ │ │removal as President of │
│ │ │ │ │ │CNDP, retains some control │
│ │ │ │ │ │over CNDP and its │
│ │ │ │ │ │international network │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│NSANZUBUKI-RE│Felicien │Fred Irakeza │1967 │ │According to multiple │
│ │ │ │ │ │sources, Felicien │
│ │ │ │Murama, │ │Nsanzubukire is the │
│ │ │ │Kinyinya, │ │ st │
│ │ │ │Rubungo, │ │1 battalion leader of │
│ │ │ │Kigali, │ │the FDLR, and is based in │
│ │ │ │Rwanda │ │the Uvira-Sange area of │
│ │ │ │ │ │South Kivu │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │Felicien Nsanzubukire has │
│ │ │ │ │ │been a member of the FDLR │
│ │ │ │ │ │since at least 1994 and │
│ │ │ │ │ │operating in eastern DRC │
│ │ │ │ │ │since October 1998. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │The UNSC DRC Sanction │
│ │ │ │ │ │Committee's Group of │
│ │ │ │ │ │Experts reports that │
│ │ │ │ │ │Felicien Nsanzubukire │
│ │ │ │ │ │supervised and coordinated │
│ │ │ │ │ │the trafficking of │
│ │ │ │ │ │ammunition and weapons │
│ │ │ │ │ │between at least November │
│ │ │ │ │ │2008 and April 2009 from │
│ │ │ │ │ │the United Republic of │
│ │ │ │ │ │Tanzania, via Lake │
│ │ │ │ │ │Tanganyika, to FDLR units │
│ │ │ │ │ │based in the Uvira and │
│ │ │ │ │ │Fizi areas of South Kivu │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│NTAWUNGUKA │Pacifique│Colonel Omega│1 January 1964, │Rwandan │Commander of the First │
│ │ │ │Gaseke, Gisenyi │ │Division of FOCA (an FDLR │
│ │ │Nzeri │Province, Rwanda │Rank: Colonel │armed branch). Military │
│ │ │ │ │ │leader of a foreign armed │
│ │ │Israel │Est. 1964 │Current Location: │group operating in the │
│ │ │ │ │Peti, Walikale - │Democratic Republic of the │
│ │ │Pacifique │ │Masisis border, │Congo, impeding the │
│ │ │Ntawungula │ │DRC │disarmament and the │
│ │ │ │ │ │voluntary repatriation and │
│ │ │ │ │Other: │resettlement of │
│ │ │ │ │Received military │combatants, in violation │
│ │ │ │ │training in Egypt │of Security Council │
│ │ │ │ │ │resolution 1857 (2008) OP │
│ │ │ │ │ │4 (b). In evidence │
│ │ │ │ │ │collated by the UNSC DRC │
│ │ │ │ │ │Sanctions Committee Group │
│ │ │ │ │ │of Experts, detailed in │
│ │ │ │ │ │its report of 13 February │
│ │ │ │ │ │2008, girls recovered from │
│ │ │ │ │ │FDLR-FOCA had previously │
│ │ │ │ │ │been abducted and sexually │
│ │ │ │ │ │abused. Since mid-2007, │
│ │ │ │ │ │FDLR-FOCA, which │
│ │ │ │ │ │previously recruited boys │
│ │ │ │ │ │in their mid to late │
│ │ │ │ │ │teens, has been forcefully │
│ │ │ │ │ │recruiting youth from the │
│ │ │ │ │ │age of 10 years. The │
│ │ │ │ │ │youngest are then used as │
│ │ │ │ │ │escorts, and older │
│ │ │ │ │ │children are deployed as │
│ │ │ │ │ │soldiers on the frontline, │
│ │ │ │ │ │in violation of Security │
│ │ │ │ │ │Council resolution 1857 │
│ │ │ │ │ │(2008) OP 4 (d) and (e) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│NYAKUNI │James │ │ │Ugandan │Trade partnership with │
│ │ │ │ │ │Commandant Jerome, │
│ │ │ │ │ │particularly smuggling │
│ │ │ │ │ │across the DRC/Uganda │
│ │ │ │ │ │border, including │
│ │ │ │ │ │suspected smuggling of │
│ │ │ │ │ │weapons and military │
│ │ │ │ │ │material in unchecked │
│ │ │ │ │ │trucks. Violation of the │
│ │ │ │ │ │arms embargo and provision │
│ │ │ │ │ │of assistance to armed │
│ │ │ │ │ │groups and militia │
│ │ │ │ │ │referred to in paragraph │
│ │ │ │ │ │20 of Res. 1493 (2003), │
│ │ │ │ │ │including financial │
│ │ │ │ │ │support that allows them │
│ │ │ │ │ │to operate militarily │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│NZEYIMANA │Stanislas│Deogratias │1 January 1966, │Rwandan │Deputy Commander of the │
│ │ │Bigaruka │Mugusa (Butare), │ │FOCA (an FDLR armed │
│ │ │Izabayo │Rwanda │As of November │branch). Military leader │
│ │ │ │ │2009, recognized │of a foreign armed group │
│ │ │Bigaruka │Est. 1967 │as Major General │operating in the │
│ │ │ │ │Stanislas │Democratic Republic of the │
│ │ │Bigurura │Alt. 28 August 1966│Nzeyimana, FDLR │Congo, impeding the │
│ │ │ │ │Deputy Commander. │disarmament and the │
│ │ │Izabayo Deo │ │ │voluntary repatriation and │
│ │ │ │ │Current location: │resettlement of │
│ │ │Jules Mateso │ │Kalonge, Masisi, │combatants, in violation │
│ │ │Mlamba │ │North Kivu, │of Security Council │
│ │ │ │ │DRC or Kibua, DRC.│resolution 1857 (2008) OP 4│
│ │ │ │ │ │(b). In evidence collated │
│ │ │ │ │Frequent travel to│by the UNSC DRC Sanctions │
│ │ │ │ │Kigoma │Committee Group of │
│ │ │ │ │ │Experts, detailed in its │
│ │ │ │ │ │report of 13 February │
│ │ │ │ │ │2008, girls recovered from │
│ │ │ │ │ │FDLR-FOCA had previously │
│ │ │ │ │ │been abducted and sexually │
│ │ │ │ │ │abused. Since mid-2007, │
│ │ │ │ │ │FDLR-FOCA, which │
│ │ │ │ │ │previously recruited boys │
│ │ │ │ │ │in their mid to late │
│ │ │ │ │ │teens, has been forcefully │
│ │ │ │ │ │recruiting youth from the │
│ │ │ │ │ │age of 10 years. The │
│ │ │ │ │ │youngest are then used as │
│ │ │ │ │ │escorts, and older │
│ │ │ │ │ │children are deployed as │
│ │ │ │ │ │soldiers on the frontline, │
│ │ │ │ │ │in violation of Security │
│ │ │ │ │ │Council resolution 1857 │
│ │ │ │ │ │(2008) OP 4 (d) and (e) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│OZIA MAZIO │Dieudonne│Ozia Mazio │6 June 1949, │Congolese │President of FEC in Aru │
│ │ │ │Ariwara │ │territory. Financial │
│ │ │ │ │Known as: │schemes with Commandant │
│ │ │ │ │'Omari' │Jerome and FAPC and │
│ │ │ │ │'Mr Oman' │smuggling across the │
│ │ │ │ │ │DRC/Uganda border, │
│ │ │ │ │Deceased in │allowing supplies and cash │
│ │ │ │ │Ariwara on 23 │to be made available to │
│ │ │ │ │September 2008 │Commandant Jerome and his │
│ │ │ │ │ │troops. Violation of the │
│ │ │ │ │ │arms embargo, including by │
│ │ │ │ │ │providing assistance to │
│ │ │ │ │ │armed groups and militia │
│ │ │ │ │ │referred to in paragraph │
│ │ │ │ │ │20 of Res. 1493 (2003) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│TAGANDA │Bosco │Bosco │ │Congolese │UPC/L military commander, │
│ │ │Ntaganda │ │ │exercising influence over │
│ │ │ │ │Known as: │policies and maintaining │
│ │ │Bosco │ │'Terminator' │command and control over │
│ │ │Ntagenda │ │'Major' │the activities of UPC/L, │
│ │ │ │ │ │one of the armed groups │
│ │ │General │ │As of November │and militias referred to │
│ │ │Taganda │ │2009, de facto │in paragraph 20 of │
│ │ │ │ │military head of │Res. 1493 (2003), involved │
│ │ │ │ │CNDP following │in the trafficking of │
│ │ │ │ │arrest of General │arms, in violation of the │
│ │ │ │ │Laurent Nkunda in │arms embargo. He was │
│ │ │ │ │January 2009. │appointed General in the │
│ │ │ │ │Former chief of │FARDC in December 2004 but │
│ │ │ │ │staff of the │refused to accept the │
│ │ │ │ │CNDP. Based in │promotion, therefore │
│ │ │ │ │Bunagana and │remaining outside of the │
│ │ │ │ │Rutshuru. │FARDC. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │Since appointment │According to the Office of │
│ │ │ │ │as the de facto │the SRSG on Children and │
│ │ │ │ │military head of │Armed Conflict, he was │
│ │ │ │ │CNDP in January │responsible for │
│ │ │ │ │2009, has been │recruitment and │
│ │ │ │ │instructed to │use of children in Ituri │
│ │ │ │ │manage integration│in 2002 and 2003, and 155 │
│ │ │ │ │into FARDC and │cases of direct and/or │
│ │ │ │ │given the post of │command responsibility for │
│ │ │ │ │deputy operational│recruitment and use of │
│ │ │ │ │commander for │children in North Kivu │
│ │ │ │ │Kimia II although │from 2002 to 2009. │
│ │ │ │ │this is officially│ │
│ │ │ │ │denied by FARDC │As CNDP Chief of Staff, │
│ │ │ │ │ │had direct and command │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsibility for the │
│ │ │ │ │ │massacre at Kiwanja │
│ │ │ │ │ │(November 2008) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│ZIMURINDA │Innocent │ │September 1, 1972 │Lt. Col. │According to multiple │
│ │ │ │ │ │sources, Lt Col Innocent │
│ │ │ │1975 │According to open-│Zimurinda, in his capacity │
│ │ │ │ │source and │as one of the commanders │
│ │ │ │Ngungu, Masisi │official │of the FARDC 231 st │
│ │ │ │Territory, North │reporting, Lt Col │Brigade, gave orders that │
│ │ │ │Kivu Province, DRC │Innocent │resulted in the massacre │
│ │ │ │ │Zimurinda was an │of over 100 Rwandan │
│ │ │ │ │officer in the │refugees, mostly women and │
│ │ │ │ │Congres National │children, during an April │
│ │ │ │ │pour la Defense du│2009 military operation in │
│ │ │ │ │Peuple (CNDP) │the Shalio area. │
│ │ │ │ │which was │ │
│ │ │ │ │integrated into │The UNSC DRC Sanctions │
│ │ │ │ │Forces Armees de │Committee's Group of │
│ │ │ │ │la Republique │Experts reported that Lt │
│ │ │ │ │Democratique du │Col Innocent Zimurinda was │
│ │ │ │ │Congo (FARDC) in │witnessed first hand │
│ │ │ │ │early 2009 │refusing to release three │
│ │ │ │ │ │children from his command │
│ │ │ │ │ │in Kalehe, on August 29, │
│ │ │ │ │ │2009. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to multiple │
│ │ │ │ │ │sources, Lt Col Innocent │
│ │ │ │ │ │Zimurinda, prior to the │
│ │ │ │ │ │CNDP's integration into │
│ │ │ │ │ │FARDC, participated in a │
│ │ │ │ │ │November 2008 CNDP │
│ │ │ │ │ │operation that resulted in │
│ │ │ │ │ │the massacre of 89 │
│ │ │ │ │ │civilians, including women │
│ │ │ │ │ │and children, in the │
│ │ │ │ │ │region of Kiwanja. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │In March 2010, 51 human │
│ │ │ │ │ │rights groups working in │
│ │ │ │ │ │eastern DRC posted a │
│ │ │ │ │ │complaint online alleging │
│ │ │ │ │ │that Lt Col Innocent │
│ │ │ │ │ │Zimurinda was responsible │
│ │ │ │ │ │for multiple human rights │
│ │ │ │ │ │abuses involving the │
│ │ │ │ │ │murder of numerous │
│ │ │ │ │ │civilians, including women │
│ │ │ │ │ │and children, between │
│ │ │ │ │ │February 2007 and August │
│ │ │ │ │ │2007. Lt Col Innocent │
│ │ │ │ │ │Zimurinda has also been │
│ │ │ │ │ │accused in the same │
│ │ │ │ │ │complaint to be │
│ │ │ │ │ │responsible for the rape │
│ │ │ │ │ │of a large number of women │
│ │ │ │ │ │and girls. │
│ │ │ │ │ │ │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to a May 21, │
│ │ │ │ │ │2010, statement by the │
│ │ │ │ │ │Special Representative of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the Secretary General for │
│ │ │ │ │ │Children and Armed │
│ │ │ │ │ │Conflict, Innocent │
│ │ │ │ │ │Zimurinda has been │
│ │ │ │ │ │involved in the arbitrary │
│ │ │ │ │ │execution of child │
│ │ │ │ │ │soldiers, including during │
│ │ │ │ │ │operation Kimia II. │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to the same │
│ │ │ │ │ │statement, he denied │
│ │ │ │ │ │access by the UN Mission │
│ │ │ │ │ │in the DRC (MONUC) to │
│ │ │ │ │ │screen troops for minors. │
│ │ │ │ │ │According to the UNSC DRC │
│ │ │ │ │ │Sanctions Committee's │
│ │ │ │ │ │Group of Experts, Lt Col │
│ │ │ │ │ │Zimurinda holds direct and │
│ │ │ │ │ │command responsibility for │
│ │ │ │ │ │child recruitment and for │
│ │ │ │ │ │maintaining children │
│ │ │ │ │ │within troops under his │
│ │ │ │ │ │command │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│BUTEMBO │ │ │Butembo, DRC │Privately-owned │Kisoni Kambale (deceased │
│AIRLINES │ │ │ │airline, operates │on 5 July 2007 and │
│(BAL) │ │ │ │out of Butembo │subsequently de-listed on │
│ │ │ │ │ │24 April 2008) used his │
│ │ │ │ │As of December │airline to transport FNI │
│ │ │ │ │2008, BAL no │gold, rations and weapons │
│ │ │ │ │longer holds an │between Mongbwalu and │
│ │ │ │ │aircraft │Butembo. This constitutes │
│ │ │ │ │operating license │'provision of assistance' │
│ │ │ │ │in the DRC │to illegal armed groups in │
│ │ │ │ │ │breach of the arms embargo │
│ │ │ │ │ │of resolutions 1493 (2003) │
│ │ │ │ │ │and 1596 (2005) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│CONGOCOM │ │ │Butembo, DRC │Gold trading house│CONGOCOM was owned by │
│TRADING HOUSE│ │ │ │in Butembo │Kisoni Kambale (deceased on│
│ │ │ │Tel: │ │5 July 2007 and │
│ │ │ │+253 (0) 99 983 784│ │subsequently de-listed on │
│ │ │ │ │ │24 April 2008). Kambale │
│ │ │ │ │ │acquired almost all the │
│ │ │ │ │ │gold production in the │
│ │ │ │ │ │Mongbwalu district, which │
│ │ │ │ │ │is controlled by the FNI. │
│ │ │ │ │ │The FNI derive substantial │
│ │ │ │ │ │income from taxes imposed │
│ │ │ │ │ │on this production. This │
│ │ │ │ │ │constitutes 'provision of │
│ │ │ │ │ │assistance' to illegal │
│ │ │ │ │ │armed groups in breach of │
│ │ │ │ │ │the arms embargo of │
│ │ │ │ │ │resolutions 1493 (2003) │
│ │ │ │ │ │and 1596 (2005) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│COMPAGNIE │ │ │CAGL Avenue │As of December │CAGL and GLBC are │
│AERIENNE DES │ │ │President Mobutu │2008, GLBC no │companies owned by Douglas │
│GRANDS LACS │ │ │Goma, DRC (CAGL │longer had any │MPAMO, an individual │
│(CAGL) │ │ │also has an office │operational │already subject to │
│ │ │ │in Gisenyi, Rwanda)│aircraft, although│sanctions under resolution │
│GREAT LAKES │ │ │ │several aircraft │1596 (2005). CAGL and GLBC │
│BUSINESS │ │ │GLBC, PO Box 315, │continued flying │were used to transport │
│COMPANY │ │ │Goma, DRC (GLBC │in 2008 despite UN│arms and ammunition in │
│(GLBC) │ │ │also has an office │sanctions │violation of the arms │
│ │ │ │in Gisenyi, Rwanda)│ │embargo of resolutions │
│ │ │ │ │ │1493 (2003) and 1596 │
│ │ │ │ │ │(2005) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│MACHANGA LTD │ │ │Kampala, Uganda │Gold export │MACHANGA bought gold │
│ │ │ │ │company │through a regular │
│ │ │ │ │in Kampala │commercial relationship │
│ │ │ │ │(Directors: │with traders in the DRC │
│ │ │ │ │Mr. Rajendra Kumar│tightly linked to │
│ │ │ │ │Vaya │militias. This constitutes │
│ │ │ │ │and Mr. Hirendra │'provision of assistance' │
│ │ │ │ │M. Vaya) │to illegal armed groups in │
│ │ │ │ │ │breach of the arms embargo │
│ │ │ │ │ │of resolutions 1493 (2003) │
│ │ │ │ │ │and 1596 (2005) │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│TOUS POUR │ │TPD │Goma, North Kivu │As of December │Implicated in violation of │
│LA PAIX ET │ │ │ │2008, TPD still │the arms embargo, by │
│LE │ │ │ │existed and had │providing assistance to │
│DEVELOPPEMENT│ │ │ │offices in several│RCD-G, particularly in │
│(NGO) │ │ │ │towns in Masisi │supplying trucks to │
│ │ │ │ │and Rutshuru │transport arms and troops, │
│ │ │ │ │territories, but │and also by transporting │
│ │ │ │ │its activities had│weapons to be distributed │
│ │ │ │ │almost ceased │to parts of the population │
│ │ │ │ │ │in Masisi and Rutshuru, │
│ │ │ │ │ │North Kivu, in early 2005 │
├─────────────┼─────────┼─────────────┼───────────────────┼──────────────────┼───────────────────────────┤
│UGANDA │ │ │Kajoka Street │Gold export │UCI bought gold through a │
│COMMERCIAL │ │ │Kisemente Kampala, │company in │regular commercial │
│IMPEX (UCI) │ │ │Uganda │Kampala. │relationship with traders │
│LTD │ │ │Tel: │(Directors: │in the DRC tightly linked │
│ │ │ │+ 256 41 533 578/9;│Mr. J. V. LODHIA -│to militias. This │
│ │ │ │ │known as "Chuni" -│constitutes 'provision of │
│ │ │ │Alternative │and his son │assistance' to illegal │
│ │ │ │address: PO Box │Mr. Kunal LODHIA) │armed groups in breach of │
│ │ │ │22709 Kampala, │ │the arms embargo of │
│ │ │ │Uganda │ │resolutions 1493 (2003) │
│ │ │ │ │ │and 1596 (2005) │
└─────────────┴─────────┴─────────────┴───────────────────┴──────────────────┴───────────────────────────┘